THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:00:35 PM
Felipe Ramirez, Tatiana
CPSO#:
94639
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Slivko, Tatiana (used until: 02 Aug 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Spanish
Education: Vladivostok State Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Tatiana Felipe Ramirez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 2022 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 21, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tatiana Felipe Ramirez to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 21, 2022: A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Felipe Ramirez engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in her practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Felipe Ramirez will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least three (3) months.
Dr. Felipe Ramirez will engage in professional education including in the areas of: delegation and supervision, medical record keeping and documentation, delegation of controlled acts, prescribing drugs and managing tests.
Dr. Felipe Ramirez’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College six (6) months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Download Full Document (PDF)