THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:43:22 PM
Karani, Yasir
CPSO#:
94633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400 Ext. 32163
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yasir Karani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 26 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASIR KARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2013 |