THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:14:43 AM
Morgan, Danielle Lindsay
CPSO#:
94560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Farrow, Danielle Lindsay (used until: 28 Feb 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellet
Hospitalist Department
Hospitalist Office 7th Floor
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-325-9366
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE LINDSAY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Sep 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2014 |