THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:20:00 AM
Atapattu, Vidura Indika
CPSO#:
94543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Sinhala
Education: Doneck Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Innisfil Health Collaborative
Rizzardo Health centre
7325 Yonge Street
Suite2300
Innisfil ON L9S2M6
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: 7054367991
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIDURA INDIKA ATAPATTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATAPATTU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2013 |