THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:01:29 PM
Zambrana, Carola
CPSO#:
94499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Santa Cabrini Hospital
5655 Rue St-Zotique Est
Montreal QC H1T 1P7
Phone: 514 252 6444
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLA ZAMBRANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMBRANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 May 2014 to 20 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2014 |