THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:01:15 AM
Ruzickova, Martina
CPSO#:
94210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5909 Veterans Memorial Lane
Mood Disorders Program: Mood and Me
Dalhousie University
Abbie J Lane BLDG, Rm 4108
Halifax NS B3H 2E2
Phone: 902 473 1126
Fax: 902 425 1243
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTINA RUZICKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Oct 2010
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2014 |