THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:09:06 PM
Romanowska, Karinka Isabelle
CPSO#:
94186
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Romanowska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |