THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 0:43:34 AM
Hanif, Hasib Mohammed
CPSO#:
94151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4019-300 Prince Philip Dr
Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiac Surgery
St. John's NL A1B 3X5
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASIB MOHAMMED HANIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2016 |