THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 0:01:36 AM
Hamid, Muhammad Akhter
CPSO#:
94134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7234
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 May 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
|
Active |