THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 20:53:07 PM
O'Meara, Aisling Judith
CPSO#:
93681
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Aisling O'Meara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:26 Aug 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2023 |