THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:34:12 AM
Creek, Kristen Lee Breanne
CPSO#:
93612
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Creek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
East Liberty Medical Centre
901 King Street West
Toronto ON M5V 3H5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 416-781-9083 / 1-888-781-9083 ext. 120
Fax: 1-888-297-9338
Date Received: 07 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2016 |