THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:10:14 PM
Yap, Stanley Alexander
CPSO#:
93492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Loyola University of Chicago, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
222-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Phone: 416-818-8876
Fax: 416-800-8762
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |