THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:26:15 AM
Mazarova, Andrea
CPSO#:
93473
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 19 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2014 |