THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:06:12 PM
Lam, Wilson
CPSO#:
93359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
6-608
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: 4169464501 Ext. 3947
Fax: 4169464407
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:04 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILSON LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |