THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 2:57:50 AM
Hendry, James Michael
CPSO#:
93070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site, Rm B3-041
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 2117
Fax: 613-545-0576
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL HENDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2017 |