THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:06:56 AM
Dawood, Ashraf Mohammed Abdulrahman
CPSO#:
92985
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |