THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:40:58 AM
Stacey, Paul Jeffrey
CPSO#:
92950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic South
Hotel Dieu Shaver Hospital
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Fax: (905) 685-5390
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Stacey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY STACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |