THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:58:57 AM
Jacob, George Puthenfurayil
CPSO#:
92899
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
744 Richmond St
Chatham ON N7M 5J5
Phone: 519-397-5628
Fax: 519-397-1314
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE PUTHENFURAYIL JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2015 |