THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:41:13 AM
Stefanski, Pawel
CPSO#:
92880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAWEL STEFANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2015 |