THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:53:15 PM
Kittmer, Tiffaney Chantal
CPSO#:
92817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
Phone: 519-524-8689 Ext. 5208
Fax: 519-524-8527
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIFFANEY CHANTAL KITTMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |