THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:57:14 PM
Gupta-Bhatnagar, Shikha
CPSO#:
92806
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gupta, Shikha (used until: 11 Feb 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIKHA GUPTA-BHATNAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA-BHATNAGAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |