THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:52:47 PM
Deobald, Raymond Gilbert
CPSO#:
92688
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2014 |