THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:27:56 AM
Al Kuwaiti, Noora Hamad Helal Thabet
CPSO#:
92561
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
12 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: United Arab Emirates University College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2010 to 05 Apr 2010
EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2023 |