THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:47:00 PM
Seski, Robert Charles
CPSO#:
92507
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Mississippi, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52226
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Seski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
|
Active |