THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:06:51 PM
Tam, Julian Siuhong
CPSO#:
92464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Ellis Hall 5th Floor
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 844-1009
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:07 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIAN SIUHONG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 20 Apr 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |