THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:21:52 PM
Silverman, Jason Andrew
CPSO#:
92428
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2010 to 14 Feb 2010
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2013 |