THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:23:55 PM
Nigil Haroon, Nisha
CPSO#:
92245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Kerala, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Humber College Blvd
Suite 610
Etobicoke Wellness Centre
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 705 280 6886
Fax: 705 822 6611
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:29 Jul 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Mar 2014
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |