THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:17:50 PM
Smart, Victoria Marie Sinclair
CPSO#:
92225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Div Medical Oncology
Floor 5
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE SINCLAIR SMART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 01 Dec 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2011 |