THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:26:07 PM
Bakeer, Mervat
CPSO#:
92179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al Quds University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Primary Care Diabetes Support Progr
346 Platt's Lane
London ON N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MERVAT BAKEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKEER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Nov 2010 to 18 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2012 |