THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:50:16 AM
Lui, Clementine Janet Pui Man
CPSO#:
92096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hematology, Queen's University
Etherington Hall, Room 2025
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 6694
Fax: 613-548-2470
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:18 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLEMENTINE JANET PUI MAN LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 21 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2013 |