THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:45:39 PM
Butty, Aurfan Nasif Nasser
CPSO#:
91622
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nasser, Aurfan Nasif (used until: 23 Jan 2017 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: 15194644400
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AURFAN NASIF NASSER BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2016 |