THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:22:02 PM
Uthayalingam, Sarangan
CPSO#:
91608
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Terrace Hill Paediatrics
217 Terrace Hill, Unit 128
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304 8882
Fax: 519 304 7880
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Uthayalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARANGAN UTHAYALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTHAYALINGAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2017 |