THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:31:05 PM
Mc Quillan, Rory Francis
CPSO#:
91567
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
17 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mc Quillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2020 |