THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:37:23 AM
Patel, Sunil Vijay
CPSO#:
91460
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7995
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:13 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNIL VIJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2015 |