THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:47:05 AM
Fotheringham, Mary Elizabeth
CPSO#:
91416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH FOTHERINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOTHERINGHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2014 |