THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:41:15 AM
Ibrahim, Jawahir Ismail Abaker
CPSO#:
91290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 935-6414
Fax: (613) 935-8560
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Sep 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAWAHIR ISMAIL ABAKER IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |