THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:38:37 AM
Diavolitsis, Panagiotis
CPSO#:
91209
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University College of Dublin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thamesford Medical Clinic
PO Box 130
Unit 4
141 Dundas Street West
Thamesford ON N0M 2M0
Phone: 519-285-3770
Fax: 519-285-3768
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PANAGIOTIS DIAVOLITSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAVOLITSIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2009 to 19 Nov 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2010 |