THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:48:17 AM
Wong, Jonathan
CPSO#:
91164
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 24 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |