THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:20:02 PM
Bondy, Lise Catherine
CPSO#:
91112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-412
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6415
Fax: (519) 646-6040
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:30 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISE CATHERINE BONDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2014 |