THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 0:10:13 AM
Carriere, Brigitte
CPSO#:
91069
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
06 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 May 2015 |