THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:48:33 AM
Bhatia, Sanjay
CPSO#:
91049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Christian Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
311 Commericial Street
Milton ON L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-1300
Fax: (905) 875-0367
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJAY BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2011 |