THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:33:44 PM
Strickland, Sarah Veronique
CPSO#:
91020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
451 Smyth Road
Room 4155
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-562-5422
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Sep 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH VERONIQUE STRICKLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRICKLAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |