THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:52:10 PM
Havey, Thomas Ciaran
CPSO#:
90791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
C/O Medical Staff Office
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Mar 2014
EL - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 19 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 24 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 24 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 24, 2021:
Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations