THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:27:41 AM
Gunton, Lara Kathryn
CPSO#:
90619
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Andrachuk, Lara Kathryn (used until: 05 Dec 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 Prince Charles Dr. North
Suite 102
Welland ON L3C 6B5
Phone: 905 732 4224
Fax: 905 227 9889
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARA KATHRYN GUNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2014 |