THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:17:12 AM
Nikneshan, Davar
CPSO#:
90471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9 - 2145 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON L5L 4L9
Phone: 905-896-3000
Fax: 905-896-8906
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVAR NIKNESHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKNESHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2015 |