THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:49:46 PM
Hamilton, Leslie Erin
CPSO#:
90452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Pathology Lab
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2241
Fax: 613-738-4837
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neuropathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE ERIN HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 08 Jun 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
EL - Neuropathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2018 |