THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:19:17 PM
Al-Battran, Mazin Hasan Mossa
CPSO#:
90394
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Saddam College of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Psychiatry Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2313
Fax: (519) 749-4289
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAZIN HASAN MOSSA AL-BATTRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BATTRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2021 |