THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:08:17 PM
Marjerrison, Stacey Leah
CPSO#:
90272
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STACEY LEAH MARJERRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARJERRISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2013 |