THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:21:35 AM
Dilworth, Neil Michael
CPSO#:
90252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Dr.
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL MICHAEL DILWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILWORTH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2011 |