THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:10:44 PM
Castro, Denise de Andrade
CPSO#:
90170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Severino Sombra, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON L7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Oct 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Apr 2022 |
|
Active |